IA HF2164 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 772.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 772.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to insurance companies acting as surety for bail bonds, including licensure requirements to act as a bail enforcement agent or business. (Formerly HSB 547.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to insurance companies acting as surety for bail bonds, including licensure requirements to act as a bail enforcement agent or business. (Formerly HSB 547.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 772. |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 772. |
2024-04-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 701. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 678. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 676. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2173. S.J. 676. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 2173. S.J. 550. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 550. |
2024-03-18 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 595. |
2024-03-18 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays 0. H.J. 594. |
2024-03-18 | House | Amendment H-8204 adopted. H.J. 593. |
2024-03-14 | House | Amendment H-8204 filed. H.J. 589. |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 587. |
2024-01-25 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 141. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB547 (Related) 2024-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2164.
SSB3024 (Related) 2024-01-30 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2173.
SF2173 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 677.
SSB3024 (Related) 2024-01-30 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2173.
SF2173 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 677.