IA SF253 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to sexual abuse in the second degree and sexual abuse in the third degree. (Formerly SSB 1014.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to sexual abuse in the second degree and sexual abuse in the third degree. (Formerly SSB 1014.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 854. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 853. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 364. |
2021-02-16 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 437. |
2021-02-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 546. |
2021-02-17 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 466. |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed House, yeas 91, nays none. H.J. 427. |
2021-02-16 | House | Substituted for HF 425. H.J. 426. |
2021-02-09 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 330. |
2021-02-09 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 326. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 291. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 291. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 264. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 259. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1014 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 253.
HSB16 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 300.
HF425 (Similar To) 2021-02-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 437.
HSB16 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 300.
HF425 (Similar To) 2021-02-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 437.