IA HF425 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 437.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 437.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to sexual abuse in the second degree and sexual abuse in the third degree.(Formerly HSB 16.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to sexual abuse in the second degree and sexual abuse in the third degree.(Formerly HSB 16.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 437. |
2021-02-16 | House | SF 253 substituted. H.J. 426. |
2021-02-09 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 308. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1014 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 253.
HSB16 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 300.
SF253 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Fiscal note.
HSB16 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 300.
SF253 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Fiscal note.