IA SSB1014 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF253
Note: Legislation replaced by HF425

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 253.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to sexual abuse in the second degree.(See SF 253.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to sexual abuse in the second degree.(See SF 253.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 253.
2021-01-19SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2021-01-13SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2021 9:45AM 217 Conference Room.
2021-01-12SenateSubcommittee: Whiting, Kinney, and Sinclair.
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2021-01-12SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

HSB16 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 300.
SF253 (Replaced by) 2021-02-17 - Message from House. S.J. 364.
HF425 (Replaced by) 2021-02-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 437.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback