IA SF180 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 804.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 804.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the appointment of a guardian ad litem, a child custody investigator or child and family reporter, or an attorney for certain child custody and visitation matters, and a guardian ad litem for certain child prosecution witnesses.(Formerly SSB 1008.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the appointment of a guardian ad litem, a child custody investigator or child and family reporter, or an attorney for certain child custody and visitation matters, and a guardian ad litem for certain child prosecution witnesses.(Formerly SSB 1008.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 804. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | HF 361 substituted. S.J. 803. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 725. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 361. S.J. 322. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 177. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 168. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1008 (Related) 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 180.
HSB19 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 361.
HF361 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1037.
HSB19 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 361.
HF361 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1037.