IA SSB1008 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF180
Note: Legislation replaced by HF361

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 180.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the appointment of a guardian ad litem for certain child prosecution witnesses.(See SF 180.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the appointment of a guardian ad litem for certain child prosecution witnesses.(See SF 180.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 180.
2021-01-20SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2021-01-19SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/20/2021 10:30AM RM 24A.
2021-01-12SenateSubcommittee: Shipley, Kinney, and Whiting.
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2021-01-12SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

HSB19 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 285.
SF180 (Replaced by) 2021-02-11 - Attached to companion HF 361. S.J. 322.
HF361 (Replaced by) 2021-02-11 - Read first time, attached to companion SF 180. S.J. 322.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback