IA HSB19 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF180
Note: Legislation replaced by HF361
Note: Legislation replaced by HF361
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 361.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 361.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the appointment of a guardian ad litem for certain child prosecution witnesses.(See HF 361.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the appointment of a guardian ad litem for certain child prosecution witnesses.(See HF 361.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 361. |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 285. |
2021-01-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-01-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/13/2021 4:00PM House Lounge. |
2021-01-12 | House | Subcommittee: Jones, Gustafson and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 72. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 69. |
2021-01-12 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1008 (Related) 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 180.
SF180 (Replaced by) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 804.
HF361 (Replaced by) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1037.
SF180 (Replaced by) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 804.
HF361 (Replaced by) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1037.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB19 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB19.html |