IA HSB182 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF235
Note: Legislation replaced by HF587
Note: Legislation replaced by HF587
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 587.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 587.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the denial and contest of probate claims.(See HF 587.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the denial and contest of probate claims.(See HF 587.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 587. |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 470. |
2021-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-02-08 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2021 12:00PM Law Library. |
2021-02-04 | House | Subcommittee: Gustafson, Meyer, B. and Wheeler. H.J. 299. |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 299. |
2021-02-04 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1037 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 235.
SF235 (Replaced by) 2021-03-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 666.
HF587 (Replaced by) 2021-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 645.
SF235 (Replaced by) 2021-03-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 666.
HF587 (Replaced by) 2021-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 645.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB182 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB182.html |