IA SSB1037 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF235
Note: Legislation replaced by HF587

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 235.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the denial and contest of probate claims.(See SF 235.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the denial and contest of probate claims.(See SF 235.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 235.
2021-01-26SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-01-21SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2021 2:30PM RM 24A.
2021-01-19SenateSubcommittee: Shipley, Bolkcom, and Taylor, J.
2021-01-13SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2021-01-13SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

SF235 (Replaced by) 2021-02-23 - Passed on file. H.J. 529.
HSB182 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 587.
HF587 (Replaced by) 2021-02-18 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 473.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback