IA HF587 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 645.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 645.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the denial and contest of probate claims.(Formerly HSB 182.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the denial and contest of probate claims.(Formerly HSB 182.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 645. |
2021-03-08 | House | SF 235 substituted. H.J. 635. |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 473. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1037 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 235.
SF235 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 666.
HSB182 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 587.
SF235 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 666.
HSB182 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 587.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF587 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF587.html |