HI SR58 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR58
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Board Of Education To Consider Requiring Students In Grades Six, Seven, And Eight To Take Courses In Physical Education And Health Education.
Title
Requesting The Board Of Education To Consider Requiring Students In Grades Six, Seven, And Eight To Take Courses In Physical Education And Health Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1434) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1185), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Riviere. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-17 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR58 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=58&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SR58_.HTM |