HI SR58 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR58
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The County Council Of The County Of Hawaii To Exercise Its Power Of Eminent Domain To Condemn Naalehu Theater To Preserve The Theater's Historic Legacy.
Title
Urging The County Council Of The County Of Hawaii To Exercise Its Power Of Eminent Domain To Condemn Naalehu Theater To Preserve The Theater's Historic Legacy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from PSM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3234), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-18 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDC, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR58 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
HR193 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 39
HR193 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 39
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=58&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SR58_.HTM |