HI SR38 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR38
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of The Attorney General To Establish A Working Group To Study Forensic Laboratories In The State.
Title
Requesting The Department Of The Attorney General To Establish A Working Group To Study Forensic Laboratories In The State.
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1246), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to JDL/PSM, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR38 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
HR81 (Same As) 2017-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR81 (Same As) 2017-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.