HI SR11 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR11
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Human Services To Not Consider Certain Benefits Under Title Ii Of The Social Security Act As Income When Determining Medicaid Eligibility.
Title
Urging The Department Of Human Services To Not Consider Certain Benefits Under Title Ii Of The Social Security Act As Income When Determining Medicaid Eligibility.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1253), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-17 2:50PM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR11 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
HR32 (Same As) 2017-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR32 (Same As) 2017-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=11&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SR11_.HTM |