HI SCR189 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR189
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Native Hawaiian Convention To Convene A Working Group To Develop Recommendations And Strategies To Create Hawaiian Nationality As A Protected Class For Purposes Of Hawaii's Anti-discrimination Laws.
Title
Urging The Native Hawaiian Convention To Convene A Working Group To Develop Recommendations And Strategies To Create Hawaiian Nationality As A Protected Class For Purposes Of Hawaii's Anti-discrimination Laws.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 2:15PM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDC. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR189 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=189&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SCR189_.HTM |