HI SCR187 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Education To Establish A Pilot Youth Development Flag Rugby Program Aimed At Reducing Risky Behaviors And Incarceration Rates Among Native Hawaiian And Pacific Islander Youth.
Title
Department of Education; Youth Development Program; Flag Rugby; Native Hawaiian and Pacific Islander Youth
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1186), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Dela Cruz, Kouchi, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=187&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SCR187_.HTM |