HI SCR170 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR170
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-16 - Referred to GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-16 - Referred to GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting All State Agencies To Take Action To Assist The State In Achieving The Seventeen United Nations Sustainable Development Goals And Indicators By 2030.
Title
Requesting All State Agencies To Take Action To Assist The State In Achieving The Seventeen United Nations Sustainable Development Goals And Indicators By 2030.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR170 (Carry Over) 2017-04-07 - Referred to EDB/HED, FIN, referral sheet 41
HCR146 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to EDB/LAB/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR146 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to EDB/LAB/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=170&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SCR170_.HTM |