HI SCR154 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR154
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorization To Issue A Quitclaim Deed To The County Of Maui For A Remnant Portion Of A State Owned Road Right-of-way At Waiakoa, Wailuku, Maui.
Title
Authorization To Issue A Quitclaim Deed To The County Of Maui For A Remnant Portion Of A State Owned Road Right-of-way At Waiakoa, Wailuku, Maui.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 03-29-17 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-17 2:50PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR154 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=154&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SCR154_.HTM |