HI SCR154 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR154
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of The Attorney General To Convene A Workplace Safety Working Group.
Title
Requesting The Department Of The Attorney General To Convene A Workplace Safety Working Group.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2009-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-04-12 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2018-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 04-12-18 11:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 537) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3442) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, S. Chang, Ihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 04-03-18 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to LBR. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR154 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.