HI SCR132 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR132
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The University Of Hawaii To Report On The Pamantasan Council's Systemwide Efforts To Improve The Status Of Filipinos At The University Of Hawaii.
Title
Requesting The University Of Hawaii To Report On The Pamantasan Council's Systemwide Efforts To Improve The Status Of Filipinos At The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 777). |
2022-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-25 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-04-25 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-18-22. |
2022-04-25 | House | Re-referred to CAI, referral sheet 52 |
2022-04-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HET with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2). |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2067-22), recommending referral to HET. |
2022-04-13 | House | The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Tam, Kapela, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nishimoto, Ward. |
2022-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 04-13-22 10:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-06 | House | Referred to CAI, HET, referral sheet 45 |
2022-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 625). |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-22. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3639) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Wakai. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HRE. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR132 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to AEN.
HCR121 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Referred to HRE.
SR116 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HCR121 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Referred to HRE.
SR116 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.