HI SCR132 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR132
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-17 - Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 46
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-17 - Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 46
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Comprehensive Management Audit Of The Public Utilities Commission.
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Comprehensive Management Audit Of The Public Utilities Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 46 |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2017-04-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 457) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1432) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1217), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR132 (Carry Over) 2017-04-17 - Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 46
HCR107 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 29
HCR107 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 29