HI SCR132 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The University Of Hawaii At Hilo To Establish A Formal Association With The Rise 21st Century After School Program.
Title
UH Hilo; R.I.S.E. Program
Sponsors
Sen. Malama Solomon [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 734). |
2013-04-24 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-24 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Brower, Har, Oshiro excused (3). |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1761), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-18 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Hanohano, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Cheape, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Takai. |
2013-04-17 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2013-04-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 04-18-13 1:00PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-16 | House | Re-referred to EDN, referral sheet 56 |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to HED/EDN, referral sheet 54 |
2013-04-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 659) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1533) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1198), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-13 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=132&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR132_.HTM |