HI SCR132 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - (S) The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - (S) The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of The Governor To Convene A Working Group To Examine The Possible Reorganization Of The Department Of Education's Adult Education Program To Better Align Portions Of The Program With Departments Or Agencies Of The State Or Counties Rather Than The Department Of Education.
Title
Adult Education; Working Group
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | (S) The committee on EDU deferred the measure. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-12 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Referred to EDU, WAM. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=132 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SCR132_.HTM |