HI SCR121 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR121
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Transportation And The City And County Of Honolulu To Make Appropriate Safety Improvements To Certain Intersections And Roadways In The Ewa Beach Area.
Title
Urging The Department Of Transportation And The City And County Of Honolulu To Make Appropriate Safety Improvements To Certain Intersections And Roadways In The Ewa Beach Area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 531) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1399) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to TRS. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR121 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 32
SR95 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR95 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.