HI SCR121 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR121
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Counties And The State To Work With Huamakahikina And Kumu Hula To Establish Policies Protecting Hula.
Title
Urging The Counties And The State To Work With Huamakahikina And Kumu Hula To Establish Policies Protecting Hula.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 776). |
2022-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-25 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2154-22), recommending adoption. |
2022-04-21 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McKelvey, Ward. |
2022-04-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 04-21-22 1:30PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2). |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2064-22), recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-04-13 | House | The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Tam, Kapela, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nishimoto, Ward. |
2022-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 04-13-22 10:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-08 | House | Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 47 |
2022-04-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 686). |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3796) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HWN/LCA. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR121 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 32
SR108 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
SR108 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.