HI SB999 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB999

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes general obligation bonds for the forest stewardship program of the department of land and natural resources to renovate the equipment and facilities of the state tree nurseries. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Forestry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-17SenateThe committee on WAM deferred the measure.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-17-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2021-02-12SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 226) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2021-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room 229.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to WTL, WAM.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB863 (Same As)
SB999 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback