HI SB970 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits any minor under the age of eighteen from possessing or smoking tobacco products. Takes effect 1/1/2014.
Title
Tobacco; Tobacco Products; Minors
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-06 | Senate | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-13 2:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDL. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1350 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=970&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB970_.HTM |