HI SB903 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB903
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of the Attorney General to establish and support a restorative justice program that, in collaboration with the prosecuting attorney of each county, offers restorative justice opportunities in each county to allow victims and offenders to participate in restorative justice. Appropriates funds. Takes effect 03/22/2075. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Restorative Justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 472) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-10-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB585 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB903 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB903 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.