HI SB821 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB821
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a minor who has reached the age of sixteen to petition the family court for emancipation. Requires the court to take certain actions regarding investigation of the petition, appointment of legal counsel and a guardian ad litem for the petitioning minor, and the findings necessary to grant the petition. Specifies the rights gained by the minor upon emancipation. Requires the court to require the minor's parents or legal guardians to pay for any services ordered by the court. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Children.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) McDermott voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1040) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-03-16 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2021-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-16-21 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 288) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 730) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-21 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 298) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB821 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB453 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB453 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1