HI SB801 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a pilot project to develop and operate statewide emergency care, hanai ohana care, and specialized learning facilities for endangered and disadvantaged children. Requires the State to lease land at a reduced rate to the department of human services for these purposes.
Title
Endangered Children; Emergency Care; Public Lands Lease; Keiki Caucus
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Bunda [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-09 1:45 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to HMS, WTL. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=801&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB801_.HTM |