HI SB694 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to EEP, WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Codifies sustainable development goals based on the United Nations' Sustainable Development Goals and indicators. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Sustainable Development Goals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11HouseReferred to EEP, WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 253) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-03-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 784) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2021-03-02SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2021-02-19SenateReported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 558) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2021-02-18SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-21 3:00PM; CR 016 & Videoconference.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to GVO, WAM.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback