HI SB688 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB688
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes violations of voting requirements for elections of a condominium association subject to the enforcement powers of the Real Estate Commission and amends the requirements for a condominium association's standard proxy form by deleting the option for a condominium owner to give the proxy to the board as a whole.
Title
Relating To Condominiums.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB495 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB688 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
SB688 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=688&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB688_.HTM |