HI SB674 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB674
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits conversion therapy for sexual orientation and gender identity. (SB674 HD1)
Title
Relating To Gender Identity.
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD/CPC with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1684) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD/CPC. |
2019-03-21 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tokioka. |
2019-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-21-19 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD/CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 215) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 882) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 474) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB664 (Same As)
SB674 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD/CPC with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
SB674 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD/CPC with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).