HI SB622 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB622
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a court to sentence a person convicted of violating a temporary restraining order, injunction or restraining order, or order of protection during the term of a stay-at-home order imposed by the State or a county in which the violation occurred to a mandatory minimum jail sentence of not less than thirty days and fined no less than $500 and no more than $3,000. Takes effect 7/30/2075. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Restraining Order Violations.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-02-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-02-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 21) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Riviere, San Buenaventura . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-09-22. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2099) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 375) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 1:20PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB622 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Subjects
Fines
Injunctions
Minimum Mandatory Sentences
Stay-at-Home Orders
Temporary Restraining Orders
Violations
Injunctions
Minimum Mandatory Sentences
Stay-at-Home Orders
Temporary Restraining Orders
Violations