HI SB622 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a court to sentence a person convicted of violating an injunction or restraining order or order of protection during the term of a stay-at-home order imposed by the State or a county in which the violation occurred to a mandatory minimum jail sentence of not less than thirty days and fined not less than $5,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Restraining Order Violations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2021-02-18SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 375) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2021-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 1:20PM; Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback