HI SB608 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB608
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-16 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-16 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a general excise tax exemption for the gross proceeds or income from the sale of groceries that are eligible under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program or Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children, regardless of the means of purchase and the program eligibility of the purchaser. Establishes a general excise tax exemption for the gross proceeds or income from the sale of nonprescription drugs.
Title
Relating To General Excise Tax Exemptions.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB608 (Carry Over) 2021-02-16 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=608&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB608_.HTM |