HI SB586 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB586
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to EDU/TRS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to EDU/TRS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of education to establish and administer a career and technology program that will provide aviation and aviation mechanics education and training to high school students.
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU/TRS, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB586 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EDU/TRS, WAM.
HB1159 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB1159 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=586&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB586_.HTM |