HI SB417 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB417
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that informal adjustment shall be prioritized over formal action for a child under family court jurisdiction solely as a result of truancy. (SB417 HD1)
Title
Relating To Children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1287) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2017-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-22-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2017-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 35). |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 547) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB417 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
HB1344 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1344 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6