HI HB1344 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1344
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that informal adjustment shall be prioritized over formal action for a child under family court jurisdiction solely as a result of truancy.
Title
Relating To Children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1344 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB417 (Same As) 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
SB417 (Same As) 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1344&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB1344_.HTM |