HI SB380 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB380
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to HLT/IAC, CPC, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to HLT/IAC, CPC, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits licensed dental hygienists in the State to operate under general, rather than direct, supervision of a licensed dentist.
Title
Relating To Dental Hygienists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT/IAC, CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 140). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Deferred until 03-07-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 559) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-17 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB380 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to HLT/IAC, CPC, referral sheet 27
HB563 (Same As) 2017-07-07 - Act 083, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1184).
HB563 (Same As) 2017-07-07 - Act 083, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1184).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=380&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB380_.HTM |