HI HB563 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Act 083, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1184).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Act 083, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1184).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits licensed dental hygienists in the State to operate under general, rather than direct, supervision of a licensed dentist in specified circumstances that protect patient health and safety. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Dental Hygienists.
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | Act 083, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1184). |
2017-07-07 | House | Act 083, on 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1184). |
2017-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 638). |
2017-04-28 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, McDermott, Quinlan, Thielen, Tokioka excused (6). |
2017-04-28 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 632). |
2017-04-27 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-04-17. |
2017-04-26 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Ohno, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-17 4:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 622). |
2017-04-24 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Ohno, Takumi Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Espero, Kidani. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 398). |
2017-04-04 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-03 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 406) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ruderman, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-03-17. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1265) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 113). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 883), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Aquino, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2017-02-24 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-01-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from HLT/IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 579) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Ward. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Tupola; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/IAC on Tuesday, 02-14-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to HLT/IAC, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |