HI SB342 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB342
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations to conduct a study on paid sick leave. Requires a report to the Legislature. Appropriates funds for the study. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Paid Sick Leave.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 420) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Lee, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to LBT, JDC/WAM. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB342 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.