HI SB3103 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - Re-Referred to TRE/WTL/PSM/HRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - Re-Referred to TRE/WTL/PSM/HRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Transportation to work in conjunction with the Department of Land and Natural Resources, the School of Ocean and Earth Science and Technology of the University of Hawaii, the county of Maui and federal agencies to develop a strategic plan to protect coastal highways from the effects of coastal erosion and update the plan as needed every five years. Requires a report to the legislature. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Coastal Highways.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE/WTL/PSM/HRE, WAM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to TRE/WTL/PSM/HRE/ETT, WAM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Same As) 2018-02-02 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3103&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB3103_.HTM |