HI HB2500 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Transportation to work in conjunction with the Department of Land and Natural Resources, the School of Ocean and Earth Science and Technology of the University of Hawaii, the county of Maui and federal agencies to develop a strategic plan to protect coastal highways from the effects of coastal erosion and update the plan as needed every five years. Requires a report to the legislature. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Coastal Highways.
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-02-18 10:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to TRN, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3103 (Same As) 2018-01-30 - Re-Referred to TRE/WTL/PSM/HRE, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2500&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2500_.HTM |