HI SB3023 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes persons with disabilities under the minimum wage requirements. Requires the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to study the impacts of raising the minimum wage and submit a report to the Legislature on its findings and recommendations. Appropriates funds. (SB3023 HD1)
Title
Relating To Minimum Wage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1418-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-20-18 10:00AM in conference room 309. |
2018-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-20-18 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 390) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2770) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 10:45AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2361) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, S. Chang, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Taniguchi. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-18 3:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to LBR, WAM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1721 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Referred to LAB, HHS, FIN, referral sheet 3