HI SB3012 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows health care providers to provide medical records to patients for a flat rate of $15.60, or the amount currently approved by the Social Security Administration, whichever amount is greater, if the request is for the purposes of a claim or appeal under any provision of the Social Security Act; or for free. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB3012 HD1)
Title
Medical Records; Social Security Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1132-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan. |
2014-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-19-14 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-14 at 10:30am. |
2014-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-14-14 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 347) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from HMS/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2601) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/JDL deferred the measure until 02-18-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HMS/JDL. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |