HI SB3006 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Referred to AEN/GVO, WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Referred to AEN/GVO, WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the Electronic Waste and Television Recycling and Recovery Act to the Electronic Device Recycling and Recovery Act. Establishes electronic device manufacturer recycling goals and record keeping and reporting requirements for manufacturers and collectors. Requires collectors to register with the department of health. Amends and repeals various definitions, including repealing "covered electronic device" and "covered television" and creating a new "electronic device" definition. Expands the recycling and collection requirements of televisions to all electronic devices. Requires the recycling electronic device program to include, among other things, a description of the methods for the convenient collection of electronic devices.
Title
Relating To Recycling.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/GVO, WAM/JDC. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1640 (Same As) 2022-06-27 - Act 151, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1252).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3006&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB3006_.HTM |