HI SB2691 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to CPN/HHS, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to CPN/HHS, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of flavored tobacco products and mislabeled e-liquid products that contain nicotine. Repeals language making the sale of cigarettes, tobacco products, and electronic smoking devices a statewide concern and preempting county ordinances and regulations. Effective 1/1/2025.
Title
Relating To Tobacco Products.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Brandon Elefante [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPN/HHS, JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1778 (Same As) 2024-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2691&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2691_.HTM |