HI HB1778 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning 7/1/2026, amends existing law regarding preemption of local ordinances and regulations regulating the sale of cigarettes, tobacco products, and electronic smoking devices as a matter of statewide concern to clarify that the State's preemption power extends solely to the taxation of cigarettes, tobacco products, and electronic smoking devices and allows counties to adopt ordinances and regulations that regulate smoking or the sale of cigarettes, tobacco products, and electronic smoking devices that do not conflict with and are more stringent than the state law that governs smoking. Prohibits the counties from enacting an ordinance or a regulation that imposes a fee or tax on the sale of cigarettes, tobacco products, or electronic smoking devices. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Tobacco Products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5). |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 471-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-02-13 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takayama. |
2024-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-13-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Ward excused (4). |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 194-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-02-07 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Ilagan, Marten, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Amato, Kobayashi; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-07-24 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-24 11:30 AM, House conference room 329. |
2024-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-02-24 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to HLT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2691 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to CPN/HHS, JDC.