HI SB2649 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - (S) Act 046, 4/22/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 504).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - (S) Act 046, 4/22/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 504).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the sunset provision in Act 138, Session Laws of Hawaii 2005, relating to providing funding to the University of Hawaii to construct or renovate housing units. (SD2)
Title
University of Hawaii; Revenue Bonds; Housing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | (S) Act 046, 4/22/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 504). | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Act 046, on 4/22/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 258). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 453). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Hanohano excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1177-10), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Awana, Sagum. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-29-10 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Manahan, Souki, Takumi excused (4). | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 740-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-09 | (H) The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Chang, Nakashima, Berg, Hanohano, Rhoads, Takumi, Yamane, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Bertram, Manahan, Saiki, Shimabukuro, Takai. | |
2010-03-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-09-10 2:05PM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 34 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 233) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2460) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hee, Tokuda. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-16-10 10:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Reported from HRE/EDH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2091) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Galuteria, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Tsutsui. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Sakamoto, Kokubun, Takamine; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Slom. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HRE/EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-10 1:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to HRE/EDH, WAM. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2641 (Same As) 2010-03-03 - (S) Referred to HRE/EDH, WAM.